Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 09/18/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/18/1990
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 09/18/1990
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 09/18/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 09/18/1990
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 09/18/1990
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/25/1990
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/28/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 09/28/1990
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 10/12/1990
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/16/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 10/17/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/18/1990
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/19/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 10/19/1990
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/19/1990