Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/02/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 02/02/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 02/02/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/08/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/22/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/17/1989
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 05/18/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/18/1990
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/18/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/22/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/25/1990
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 09/14/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/14/1990