Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/07/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/07/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/07/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/07/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/09/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 02/09/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/28/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 02/28/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/28/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/28/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/06/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/06/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 03/16/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/16/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/17/1989
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 03/17/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/04/1989
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/04/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/04/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 04/04/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/04/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 04/04/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/04/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 04/04/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/04/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 04/04/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/04/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/04/1989
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 04/04/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/04/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/07/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/07/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/11/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/11/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 04/19/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/01/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/03/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 05/09/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/09/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/11/1989
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 05/11/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/11/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/18/1989
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/31/1989
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 05/31/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/31/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/07/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 06/15/1989
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 06/15/1989
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/15/1989
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/21/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/21/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/21/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 09/21/1989
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/21/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 10/02/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/02/1989