Committees: S.358 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary02/07/1989 Referred to
06/08/1989 Markup by
06/19/1989 Reported by S.Rept 101-55
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs02/24/1989 Referred to
03/03/1989 Hearings by
House Judiciary07/25/1989 Referred to
10/03/1990 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law07/28/1989 Referred to
03/14/1990 Hearings by