Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/08/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/09/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/09/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/22/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 03/08/1989
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 03/09/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 04/04/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 04/12/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/04/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 05/09/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/18/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 06/06/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 07/13/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/20/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/06/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/16/1990