Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/25/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 01/25/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/02/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/17/1989
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/17/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 05/04/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/10/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/16/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 05/16/1989