Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/15/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/06/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/06/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 04/13/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 05/03/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/04/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/10/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/10/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/12/1989
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 05/12/1989
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/18/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/18/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/18/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/18/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 05/18/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/31/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/31/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/31/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/31/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/31/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 06/07/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/07/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/07/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/20/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/20/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/20/1989
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/20/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/23/1989
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 06/23/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/24/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 08/02/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/06/1989