Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 03/17/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 04/05/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/05/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 04/05/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/05/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 04/05/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 04/05/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/05/1989
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 04/05/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/12/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 04/12/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/12/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 04/12/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 04/12/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/12/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/12/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/12/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 04/18/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/18/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/18/1989
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/18/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/10/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/10/1989