There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill
  • Silver Coin Proof Set Act
  • Statehood Centennial Commemorative Coin Act of 1989
Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Silver Coin Proof Set Act
  • Statehood Centennial Commemorative Coin Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue coins in commemoration of the 100th anniversary of the statehood of Idaho, North Dakota, South Dakota, Washington, and Wyoming, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/18/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/17/1989Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Riegle without amendment. Without written report.
03/17/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
08/01/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs and Coinage.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
07/24/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
07/24/1989-12:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/24/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/18/1989SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/18/1989SenateS.Amdt.283 Amendment SP 283 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
07/18/1989SenateS.Amdt.283 Proposed by Senator Mitchell for Senator Baucus. To make certain technical corrections.
07/18/1989SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
07/17/1989SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 155.
07/17/1989SenateCommittee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Riegle without amendment. Without written report.
07/13/1989SenateCommittee on Banking. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/17/1989SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 03/17/1989
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 03/17/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 06/01/1989
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/01/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/01/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/01/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/01/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/01/1989
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 06/01/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/01/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/01/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 06/01/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/01/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/01/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/01/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/01/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/01/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/01/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/01/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/01/1989
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 06/01/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/01/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/01/1989
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 06/01/1989
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/01/1989
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/01/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/01/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/13/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/13/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/13/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/13/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/13/1989
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/13/1989
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/13/1989
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/13/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/13/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/13/1989

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs03/17/1989 Referred to
07/13/1989 Markup by
07/17/1989 Reported by
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs07/24/1989 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs and Coinage08/01/1989 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.681. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/18/1989)

Title I: Statehood Centennial Coin - Statehood Centennial Commemorative Coin Act of 1989 - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue up to a specified maximum number of one-dollar silver coins and five-dollar palladium coins in commemoration of the 100th anniversary of the statehood of Idaho, Montana, North Dakota, South Dakota, Washington, and Wyoming.

Sets forth certain features of such coins and provides for their design, issuance, and sale.

Requires the Secretary to obtain palladium for the five-dollar coins by purchase of palladium mined and refined in the United States.

Requires the Secretary to obtain silver for the one-dollar coins only from stockpiles established under the Strategic and Critical Materials Stock Piling Act.

Requires the Secretary to provide a specified amount of all surcharges to the Documents West exhibition program with the remaining amount of surcharges to be deposited in the Treasury for use in reducing the national debt.

Grants the Comptroller General the right to examine records and other data of the Idaho Centennial Commission.

Title II: Silver Proof Sets - Silver Coin Proof Set Act - Authorizes the Secretary to mint and issue silver coin proof sets. Sets forth specified features of such coins and provides for their sale to the public.

Requires the Secretary to obtain silver for such coins by purchase from stockpiles established under the Strategic and Critical Materials Stock Piling Act and from Treasury stocks on hand.