Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 04/05/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/05/1989
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 04/05/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 04/05/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 04/05/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 04/13/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 09/15/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/15/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/28/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 09/28/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 09/28/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/28/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/07/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/25/1990

Show cosponsors who withdrew