Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 04/06/1989
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 04/06/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/06/1989
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 04/06/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 04/06/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 04/06/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 04/06/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/06/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/06/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/06/1989
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 04/12/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 04/12/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/18/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 04/18/1989
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 05/02/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 05/02/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/04/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/11/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/11/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 05/16/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 05/16/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/16/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/17/1989
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 05/18/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 05/18/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 05/18/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/18/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 05/18/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/01/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/01/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/01/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/01/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/01/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/06/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/09/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 07/13/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 07/19/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 07/25/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/26/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/27/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 08/01/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 08/02/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 08/03/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/06/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/07/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/15/1989
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/20/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 09/22/1989
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/03/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/03/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/17/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/17/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/31/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/31/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 11/15/1989
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/15/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 11/19/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/20/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 01/23/1990
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 05/03/1990

Show cosponsors who withdrew