Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 09/12/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/15/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/21/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 02/05/1990
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 02/05/1990
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/28/1990