Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/02/1989
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/07/1989
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 02/22/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/22/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/22/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/22/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/22/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/22/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 02/22/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/28/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 03/03/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 03/15/1989
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/15/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/17/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 04/04/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/04/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/17/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/17/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/11/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/06/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/14/1989
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/14/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/17/1989
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 07/17/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/17/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/17/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/17/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/27/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/13/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/13/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 09/13/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 09/13/1989
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/13/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/13/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 09/13/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/13/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/13/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 09/13/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/13/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/04/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/04/1989
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 10/04/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/04/1989
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 10/04/1989
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 10/04/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/04/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 10/04/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/04/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 10/04/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/27/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 10/27/1989
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 10/27/1989