There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Route 66 Study Act of 1990

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Route 66 Study Act of 1990

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Route 66 Study Act of 1989

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Route 66 Study Act of 1989

Short Titles as Introduced

Route 66 Study Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize a study on methods to commemorate the nationally significant highway known as Route 66, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
09/28/1990Became Public Law No: 101-400.
09/28/1990Signed by President.
09/19/1990Presented to President.
09/13/1990Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
07/31/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
07/31/1990Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs discharged.
08/02/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/27/1989Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment. With written report No. 101-89.
05/10/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber
09/28/1990Became Public Law No: 101-400.
09/28/1990Signed by President.
09/19/1990SenatePresented to President.
09/18/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
09/14/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/13/1990SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
07/31/1990SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
07/31/1990-3:09pmHouseA similar measure H.R. 3493 was laid on the table without objection.
07/31/1990-3:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/31/1990-3:09pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
07/31/1990-3:09pmHouseThe House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 3493. Agreed to without objection.
07/31/1990-3:09pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
07/31/1990-3:09pmHouseMr. Vento asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
07/31/1990HouseCommittee on Interior and Insular Affairs discharged.
06/05/1990HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
11/17/1989HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
11/06/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
10/19/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
08/04/1989-5:51pmHouseHeld at the desk.
08/04/1989-5:48pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/04/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/02/1989SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/27/1989SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
07/27/1989SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment. With written report No. 101-89.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
07/19/1989SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
07/10/1989SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from the Department of Interior. F.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
06/21/1989SenateSubcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests
06/07/1989SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from the Department of Interior.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
05/11/1989SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
05/10/1989SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/10/1989 Referred to
07/19/1989 Markup by
07/27/1989 Reported by S.Rept 101-89
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests05/11/1989 Referred to
06/21/1989 Hearings by
House Interior and Insular Affairs10/19/1989 Referred to
07/31/1990 Discharged from
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands11/06/1989 Referred to
06/05/1990 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (17)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.963. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/31/1990)

Route 66 Study Act of 1990 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Director of the National Park Service and in cooperation with the respective States, to coordinate a comprehensive study of U.S. Route 66. Specifies that such study shall include: (1) an evaluation of the significance of the Route in American history; (2) options for preservation and use of remaining segments and for the preservation and interpretation of significant features associated with the highway; and (3) participation by representatives from each of the States traversed by the Route, State historic preservation offices, representatives of associations interested in the Route's preservation, and persons knowledgeable in American history, historic preservation, and popular culture.

Directs the Secretary to submit such study to specified congressional committees within two years after funds are made available.

Declares that nothing in this Act shall be construed to authorize the National Park Service to assume responsibility for the maintenance of the Route.

Authorizes appropriations.