Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/11/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/11/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 05/11/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/12/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/16/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/16/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/16/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/18/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/06/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/31/1989
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 10/03/1989