Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/11/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 05/11/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/11/1989
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/31/1989
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/31/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/31/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/31/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/31/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/31/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/13/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/13/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/13/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/13/1989
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/22/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/22/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 06/22/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 07/11/1989
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 07/11/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 07/13/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/24/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/02/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 10/31/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 11/21/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/01/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 04/19/1990
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/22/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/07/1990