Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 05/12/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/12/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/12/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/18/1989
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/09/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/23/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/21/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 08/03/1990