There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Biological Weapons Anti-Terrorism Act of 1989

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Biological Weapons Anti-Terrorism Act of 1989

Short Titles as Introduced

Biological Weapons Anti-Terrorism Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to implement the Convention on the Prohibition of the Development, Production, and Stockpiling of Bacteriological (Biological) and Toxin Weapons and Their Destruction, by prohibiting certain conduct relating to biological weapons, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
05/22/1990Became Public Law No: 101-298.
05/22/1990Signed by President.
05/10/1990Presented to President.
05/08/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
11/21/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/16/1989Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 101-210.
05/16/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/22/1990Became Public Law No: 101-298.
05/22/1990Signed by President.
05/10/1990SenatePresented to President.
05/10/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
05/08/1990-3:00pmHouseA similar measure H.R. 237 was laid on the table without objection.
05/08/1990-3:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/08/1990-3:00pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
05/08/1990-2:58pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
05/08/1990-2:58pmHouseMr. Kastenmeier asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
11/21/1989-9:50pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/21/1989-8:30pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/21/1989SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/16/1989SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 393.
11/16/1989SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 101-210.
11/16/1989SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
10/21/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/26/1989SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-416.
05/16/1989SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary05/16/1989 Referred to
07/26/1989 Hearings by
11/16/1989 Markup by
11/16/1989 Reported by S.Rept 101-210

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.993. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/21/1989)

Biological Weapons Anti-Terrorism Act of 1989 - Declares it to be the purpose of this Act to implement the Biological Weapons Convention and to protect the United States from biological terrorism.

Amends the Federal criminal code to impose criminal penalties upon anyone who knowingly develops, produces, stockpiles, transfers, acquires, retains, or possesses any biological agent, toxin, or delivery system for use as a weapon or assists a foreign state or any organization to do so. Provides for extraterritorial Federal jurisdiction over an offense committed by or against a U.S. national.

Authorizes the Attorney General to request the issuance of a warrant authorizing the seizure of any such agent, toxin, or delivery system that exists by reason of conduct prohibited under this Act or that is of a type or in a quantity that has no apparent justification for prohylactic, protective, or other peaceful purposes. Authorizes the seizure and destruction of such an agent, toxin, or delivery system upon probable cause without a warrant in exigent circumstances. Establishes as an affirmative defense against forfeiture that such agent, toxin, or delivery system is for a peaceful purpose and is of a type or quantity reasonable for that purpose.

Authorizes the United States to obtain an injunction against conduct prohibited by this Act.

Authorizes the interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications related to biological weapons offenses under specified conditions.