Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 01/31/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 01/31/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/31/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 02/02/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/02/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/07/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/07/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/07/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/07/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/28/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/02/1989
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/07/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/04/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/04/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/12/1989

Show cosponsors who withdrew