Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/20/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/20/1990
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/20/1990
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 03/20/1990
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/21/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/21/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 03/21/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/21/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/21/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/21/1990
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 03/21/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/21/1990
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 03/21/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/21/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/21/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/21/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 03/21/1990
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/21/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/21/1990
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/21/1990
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/21/1990
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/21/1990
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/21/1990
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 03/21/1990
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 03/21/1990
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/21/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/21/1990
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/21/1990
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 03/22/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/22/1990
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/22/1990
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/22/1990
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/22/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/22/1990
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/22/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/22/1990
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/22/1990
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 03/22/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/22/1990
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 03/22/1990
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/22/1990
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/22/1990
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/22/1990
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/22/1990
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/22/1990
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/22/1990
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 03/22/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/22/1990
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/22/1990
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/22/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/22/1990
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/22/1990
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 03/22/1990
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/22/1990
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/22/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/22/1990
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/22/1990
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/22/1990
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 03/22/1990
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 03/22/1990
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 03/22/1990
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 03/22/1990
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/22/1990
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/22/1990
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/22/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/27/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/27/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 04/03/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 04/05/1990