Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/03/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/03/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/03/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 05/03/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 05/03/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/03/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 05/03/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/03/1990
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 05/17/1990
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/06/1990
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/06/1990
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/11/1990
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/11/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/20/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/20/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/21/1990
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/21/1990