Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 05/04/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/14/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/14/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/14/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/14/1990
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/14/1990
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/14/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/15/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/16/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/21/1990
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 05/21/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/21/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/22/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 05/22/1990
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/22/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/23/1990
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/05/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/06/1990
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 06/08/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/08/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/18/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/18/1990
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/21/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/21/1990
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/25/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/27/1990
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/25/1990
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 08/02/1990