There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution to designate June 21, 1989, as Chaney, Goodman, and Schwerner Day.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
06/20/1989Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
06/20/1989Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
06/20/1989Committee on Judiciary discharged.
06/09/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/08/1989Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
05/18/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/20/1989HouseSubcommittee on Census and Population Discharged.
06/20/1989-2:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/20/1989-2:03pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
06/20/1989HouseCommittee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
06/20/1989HouseCommittee on Judiciary discharged.
06/20/1989-2:01pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
06/20/1989-2:01pmHouseMr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committees and consider.
06/19/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/16/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
06/13/1989HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
06/13/1989HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Judiciary.
06/13/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/13/1989-12:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/09/1989SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/08/1989SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 114.
06/08/1989SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
06/08/1989SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/18/1989SenateReferred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/01/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/01/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/01/1989
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 06/01/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/01/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 06/01/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/01/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/01/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/01/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/01/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 06/01/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/01/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/01/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/01/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/01/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/01/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/01/1989
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 06/01/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/01/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/01/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/01/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/01/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/01/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/01/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/01/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/01/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/01/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/01/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/01/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 06/01/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/01/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/01/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 06/01/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 06/06/1989
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/06/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/06/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/06/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/06/1989
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/06/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 06/06/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 06/06/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/06/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/06/1989
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/06/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 06/06/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/06/1989
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 06/06/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 06/06/1989
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 06/06/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/06/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 06/06/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/08/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/08/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/13/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/21/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/12/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/12/1989

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/18/1989 Referred to
06/08/1989 Markup by
06/08/1989 Reported by
House Judiciary06/13/1989 Referred to
06/20/1989 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights06/19/1989 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service06/13/1989 Referred to
06/20/1989 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population06/16/1989 Referred to
06/20/1989 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.40. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/18/1989)

Designates June 21, 1989, as Chaney, Goodman, and Schwerner Day.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the Voting Rights Act of 1965 has helped to fulfill the promise of democracy in this Nation.

Reaffirms the goal of removing remaining barriers to full voter participation in this Nation.