Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 08/04/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 08/04/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 08/04/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 08/04/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 08/04/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 08/04/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 08/04/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 08/04/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 08/04/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/20/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/28/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/04/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 10/04/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 10/04/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/04/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/04/1989
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 10/04/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/04/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 10/04/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/04/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/04/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/04/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/24/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/24/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/21/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 11/21/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/21/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/28/1990
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 08/03/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/03/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 08/03/1990
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 08/03/1990
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 08/03/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 08/03/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/03/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 08/03/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 08/03/1990
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 08/03/1990
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 08/03/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/03/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 08/03/1990
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 08/03/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 08/03/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 08/03/1990
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 08/03/1990
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/03/1990
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 08/03/1990
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 08/03/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/03/1990
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 08/03/1990