There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution to deplore the unilateral Sandinista abrogation of the Nicaraguan Ceasefire.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
11/02/1989Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
11/02/1989Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
10/31/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 95-0. Record Vote No: 279.
10/31/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
11/02/1989-12:52pmHouseA similar measure H. Con. Res. 221 was laid on the table without objection.
11/02/1989-12:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/02/1989-12:50pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
11/02/1989-12:49pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
11/02/1989HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
11/02/1989-12:47pmHouseMr. Fascell asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
11/01/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
11/01/1989-3:32pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/01/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/31/1989SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 95-0. Record Vote No: 279.

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 10/31/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 10/31/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 10/31/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 10/31/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 10/31/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 10/31/1989

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs11/01/1989 Referred to
11/02/1989 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.79. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/31/1989)

Condemns Daniel Ortega's announced intention to abrogate the ceasefire in Nicaragua as unjustified and a threat to peace. Urges the Sandinistas to renew their commitment to continuing the ceasefire.

Insists that Ortega and the Sandinistas reaffirm their pledge to hold elections on February 25, 1990, and begin to carry out in good faith their commitment to a free and fair electoral process leading up to those elections. Deplores any effort by the Sandinista regime to terminate, postpone, or curtail progress in fulfilling such commitment or to impose emergency laws under the pretext of a breakdown of the ceasefire.

Urges the extension of the grace period during which Nicaraguans are permitted to register to vote for at least 60 days.

Reaffirms the Congress's intention to abide by the provisions of the Bipartisan Accord on Nicaragua and Public Law 101-14, to include continuing to provide humanitarian assistance to the contras until February 28, 1990. Reminds Ortega, the Sandinistas, and the other leaders of the hemisphere that U.S. policy articulated therein is contingent upon the Sandinistas fulfilling their commitments as part of the Central American peace process.