Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 05/11/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/11/1989
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/11/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 05/16/1989
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/16/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/16/1989
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/17/1989
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 06/06/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/09/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 06/22/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/11/1989