Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 04/18/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/18/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 04/18/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/18/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 04/18/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 04/19/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/19/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/19/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/19/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 04/19/1989
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 04/19/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 04/19/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/19/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/19/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/19/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 04/19/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 04/19/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/19/1989
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/19/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 04/19/1989
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 04/19/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 04/19/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/19/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/19/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/19/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 04/19/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 05/01/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 05/01/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/01/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/01/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/01/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/01/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/01/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/01/1989
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/01/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 05/03/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/03/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/03/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/03/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 05/09/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/09/1989
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/09/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/10/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/10/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/16/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/16/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/16/1989
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 05/16/1989
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 05/16/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/16/1989
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 05/31/1989