There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate August 1, 1989, as "Helsinki Human Rights Day".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/02/1989Became Public Law No: 101-69.
08/02/1989Signed by President.
08/01/1989Presented to President.
07/31/1989Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
06/09/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/08/1989Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
06/07/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
08/02/1989Became Public Law No: 101-69.
08/02/1989Signed by President.
08/01/1989SenatePresented to President.
08/01/1989SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
07/31/1989-12:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/31/1989-12:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
07/31/1989-12:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
07/31/1989HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
07/31/1989-12:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
07/31/1989-12:52pmHouseMr. Fascell moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
06/26/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/26/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/15/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
06/13/1989HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
06/13/1989HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
06/13/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/13/1989-12:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/09/1989SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/08/1989SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112.
06/08/1989SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
06/08/1989SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/07/1989SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/07/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 06/07/1989
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 06/07/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/08/1989

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/07/1989 Referred to
06/08/1989 Markup by
06/08/1989 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs06/13/1989 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East06/26/1989 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations06/26/1989 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service06/13/1989 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population06/15/1989 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.150. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/07/1989)

Designates August 1, 1989, as Helsinki Human Rights Day. Requests the President to: (1) reassert American commitment to the Helsinki Accords; (2) raise the issue of noncompliance with such Accords with any signatory nation which may be in violation, in particular, the Soviet Union, Bulgaria, Czechoslovakia, the German Democratic Republic, Hungary, Poland, and Romania; (3) convey to all signatories of such Accords that respect for human rights and fundamental freedoms is vital to progress in the ongoing Helsinki process; and (4) convey to U.S. allies the necessity of unity regarding such Accords.