There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution designating the week of March 1 through March 7, 1990 as "National Quarter Horse Week".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
02/27/1990Became Public Law No: 101-248.
02/27/1990Signed by President.
02/26/1990Presented to President.
02/21/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
02/21/1990Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
10/20/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
10/18/1989Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
08/03/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
02/27/1990Became Public Law No: 101-248.
02/27/1990Signed by President.
02/26/1990SenatePresented to President.
02/26/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
02/21/1990-2:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/21/1990-2:14pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
02/21/1990-2:13pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
02/21/1990HouseCommittee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
02/21/1990-2:13pmHouseMr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
11/01/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
10/23/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
10/23/1989-5:59pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/23/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/20/1989SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
10/18/1989SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 307.
10/18/1989SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
10/17/1989SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
08/03/1989SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 08/03/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 09/14/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/14/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/14/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/14/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/14/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/15/1989
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 09/20/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 09/20/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/20/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 09/20/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/20/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 09/20/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/20/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 09/22/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/22/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 09/22/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/22/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/27/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/27/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/27/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 09/27/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 09/27/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/27/1989
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 09/27/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 09/27/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/27/1989
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/28/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/28/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 09/28/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/28/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/28/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/28/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/28/1989
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/28/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/02/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/03/1989
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 10/03/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/03/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/03/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 10/03/1989
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/03/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/03/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 10/03/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 10/03/1989
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 10/03/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/03/1989
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 10/03/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/03/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/03/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/03/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 10/03/1989
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 10/03/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 10/03/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/03/1989
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/03/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/03/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/06/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/31/1989

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary08/03/1989 Referred to
10/17/1989 Markup by
10/18/1989 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service10/23/1989 Referred to
02/21/1990 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population11/01/1989 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.186. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/03/1989)

Designates the week of March 1 through March 7, 1990, as National Quarter Horse Week.