There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution calling upon the United Nations to repeal General Assembly Resolution 3379.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/29/1990Became Public Law No: 101-317.
06/29/1990Signed by President.
06/20/1990Presented to President.
06/18/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
05/03/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
03/06/1990Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
01/31/1990Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
06/29/1990Became Public Law No: 101-317.
06/29/1990Signed by President.
06/20/1990SenatePresented to President.
06/19/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
06/18/1990-12:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/18/1990-12:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
06/18/1990-12:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
06/18/1990HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
06/18/1990-12:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
06/18/1990-12:42pmHouseMr. Levine (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
05/17/1990HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/17/1990HouseOrdered to be Reported.
05/07/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
05/07/1990-12:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/03/1990SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
03/06/1990SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/06/1990SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 472.
03/06/1990SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
01/31/1990SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/31/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 01/31/1990
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 01/31/1990
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 01/31/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/31/1990
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 01/31/1990
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 01/31/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 01/31/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/05/1990
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/05/1990
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/05/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/05/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/05/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/05/1990
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/05/1990
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/05/1990
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/05/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/05/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/05/1990
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/05/1990
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/07/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/07/1990
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 02/07/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/07/1990
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/07/1990
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/07/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/07/1990
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 02/07/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/07/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/07/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/07/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 02/07/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/08/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 02/08/1990
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/21/1990
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/21/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 02/21/1990
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/21/1990
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/21/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/21/1990
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/21/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/21/1990
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 02/21/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 03/01/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/01/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/01/1990
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 03/01/1990
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/06/1990
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 03/06/1990
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/06/1990
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/07/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/21/1990
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 04/02/1990
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/04/1990
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/30/1990
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 05/03/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/31/1990 Referred to
03/06/1990 Markup by
03/06/1990 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs05/07/1990 Referred to
05/17/1990 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.246. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/31/1990)

Calls upon the United Nations to repeal General Assembly Resolution 3379 (equating Zionism with racism).

Commends the President for his commitment to this goal and requires progress reports to the Congress.