There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution designating "Baltic Freedom Day".


Actions Overview (9)

Date
06/18/1990Became Public Law No: 101-309.
06/18/1990Signed by President.
06/13/1990Presented to President.
06/12/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
06/12/1990Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
06/12/1990Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
02/26/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
02/22/1990Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
02/07/1990Introduced in Senate

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
06/18/1990Became Public Law No: 101-309.
06/18/1990Signed by President.
06/13/1990SenatePresented to President.
06/13/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
06/13/1990HouseExecutive Comment Received from State.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/12/1990-4:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/12/1990-4:58pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
06/12/1990-4:51pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
06/12/1990HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
06/12/1990HouseCommittee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
06/12/1990-4:49pmHouseMr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
06/12/1990HouseSubcommittee on Census and Population Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
03/06/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
03/05/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/05/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/05/1990HouseExecutive Comment Requested from State.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/27/1990HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
02/27/1990HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/27/1990-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
02/26/1990SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
02/22/1990SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/22/1990SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 455.
02/22/1990SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/07/1990SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 02/07/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/07/1990
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/07/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/26/1990
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 02/26/1990
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/26/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/26/1990
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 02/26/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 02/26/1990
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/26/1990
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/26/1990
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/26/1990
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 02/26/1990

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/07/1990 Referred to
02/22/1990 Markup by
02/22/1990 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs02/27/1990 Referred to
06/12/1990 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East03/05/1990 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations03/05/1990 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service02/27/1990 Referred to
06/12/1990 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population03/06/1990 Referred to
06/12/1990 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.251. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/07/1990)

Urges the Soviet Union to recognize the sovereignty of the Baltic States. Designates June 14, 1990, as Baltic Freedom Day.