There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An Act to designate the week of November 3, 1990, to November 10, 1990, as "National Week to Commemorate the Victims of the Famine in the Ukraine, 1932-1933," and to commemorate the Ukrainian famine of 1932-1933 and the policies of Russification to suppress Ukrainian identity.

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate the week of June 17, 1990 through June 23, 1990 as "National Week to Commemorate the Victims of the Famine in Ukraine, 1932-1933", and to commemorate the Ukrainian famine of 1932-1933 and the policies of Russification to suppress Ukrainian identity.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
11/28/1990Became Public Law No: 101-642.
11/28/1990Signed by President.
11/20/1990Presented to President.
10/27/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
10/27/1990Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
10/27/1990Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
10/20/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
10/20/1990Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/24/1990Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
11/28/1990Became Public Law No: 101-642.
11/28/1990Signed by President.
11/20/1990SenatePresented to President.
11/19/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/27/1990-4:21pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/27/1990-4:21pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
10/27/1990-4:20pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
10/27/1990-4:19pmHouseMr. Fascell asked unanimous consent to discharge from committees and consider.
10/27/1990HouseCommittee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
10/27/1990HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
10/22/1990HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
10/22/1990HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
10/22/1990-2:48pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/22/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/20/1990SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
10/20/1990SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
10/20/1990SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/24/1990SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/24/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/06/1990
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/06/1990
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/06/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/06/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/06/1990
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 06/08/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/08/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 06/08/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/08/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/08/1990
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/08/1990
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 06/08/1990
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/08/1990
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/08/1990
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/08/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 06/08/1990
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 06/13/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/13/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/13/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/18/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/18/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/18/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/18/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/18/1990
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/20/1990
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/21/1990
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/25/1990
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 06/25/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/27/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/10/1990
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/13/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/17/1990
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/24/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 07/24/1990
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/26/1990
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/10/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 09/10/1990
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/14/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/18/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/18/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/26/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/03/1990
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 10/11/1990

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/24/1990 Referred to
10/20/1990 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service10/22/1990 Referred to
10/27/1990 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs10/22/1990 Referred to
10/27/1990 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.329.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.329. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/20/1990)

Designates the week of November 3 through November 10, 1990, as National Week to Commemorate the Victims of the Famine in Ukraine, 1932-1933.

Condemns the disregard for human rights characterized by the Soviet Union during the famine and expresses sympathy for victims of the famine.

Requests the President to call attention to Soviet policies that caused the famine and that have suppressed Ukrainian human rights and the expression of cultural and social heritage.

Recognizes the reforms underway in the Ukraine and urges the Soviet Government to: (1) move forward toward democratization and restructuring; and (2) provide a framework for the realization of the rights and aspirations of the Ukrainian people.