Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/24/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/06/1990
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/06/1990
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/06/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/06/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/06/1990
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 06/08/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/08/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 06/08/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/08/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/08/1990
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/08/1990
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 06/08/1990
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/08/1990
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/08/1990
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/08/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 06/08/1990
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 06/13/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/13/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/13/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/18/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/18/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/18/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/18/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/18/1990
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/20/1990
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/21/1990
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/25/1990
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 06/25/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/27/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/10/1990
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/13/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/17/1990
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/24/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 07/24/1990
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/26/1990
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/10/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 09/10/1990
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/14/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/18/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/18/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/26/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/03/1990
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 10/11/1990