There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate August 1, 1990, as "Helsinki Human Rights Day".


Actions Overview (9)

Date
07/31/1990Became Public Law No: 101-341.
07/31/1990Signed by President.
07/30/1990Presented to President.
07/26/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
07/26/1990Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
07/26/1990Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
06/29/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/27/1990Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
06/22/1990Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
07/31/1990Became Public Law No: 101-341.
07/31/1990Signed by President.
07/30/1990SenatePresented to President.
07/27/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
07/26/1990-6:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/26/1990-6:34pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
07/26/1990-6:33pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
07/26/1990-6:33pmHouseMr. Fascell asked unanimous consent to discharge from committees and consider.
07/26/1990HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
07/26/1990HouseCommittee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
07/26/1990HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/26/1990HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/12/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/12/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/10/1990HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
07/10/1990HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
07/10/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/10/1990-12:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/29/1990SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/27/1990SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 653.
06/27/1990SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
06/27/1990SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/22/1990SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 06/22/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/22/1990
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 06/26/1990
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/23/1990

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/22/1990 Referred to
06/27/1990 Markup by
06/27/1990 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service07/10/1990 Referred to
07/26/1990 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs07/10/1990 Referred to
07/26/1990 Markup by
07/26/1990 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East07/12/1990 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations07/12/1990 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.339. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/22/1990)

Designates August 1, 1990, as Helsinki Human Rights Day. Authorizes and requests the President to: (1) reassert American commitment to the Helsinki Accords; (2) raise the issue of noncompliance with such Accords with any signatory nation which may be in violation; (3)convey to all signatories of such Accords that respect for human rights and fundamental freedoms is vital to progress in the ongoing Helsinki process; and (4) develop new proposals to advance the human rights objectives of the Helsinki process, including the self-determination of peoples.