Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/19/1990
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 09/19/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/19/1990
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/24/1990
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/24/1990
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/24/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/24/1990
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/24/1990
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/25/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 09/25/1990
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 09/25/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/25/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/25/1990
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/25/1990
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/25/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/25/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 09/25/1990
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 09/25/1990
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 09/25/1990
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 09/26/1990
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/26/1990
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/26/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/26/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 09/26/1990
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/26/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/26/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/27/1990
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 09/27/1990
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 09/27/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 09/27/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 09/27/1990
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 09/27/1990
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 09/27/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/27/1990
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 10/01/1990
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/01/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/01/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/01/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/01/1990
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/01/1990
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 10/01/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/01/1990
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/01/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/01/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/01/1990
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 10/01/1990
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/03/1990
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/03/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 10/03/1990
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/04/1990
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 10/04/1990
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/04/1990
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/04/1990
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/09/1990
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/09/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 10/09/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 10/09/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/09/1990
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 10/12/1990