Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO]* 10/18/1990
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 10/18/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 10/18/1990
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 10/18/1990
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 10/18/1990
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 10/18/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/18/1990
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 10/18/1990
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/22/1990
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/22/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/23/1990
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 10/23/1990
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 10/23/1990
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/23/1990
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/23/1990
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 10/23/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 10/23/1990
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 10/23/1990
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/25/1990
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/25/1990
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/25/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 10/25/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/25/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/25/1990
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/25/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 10/25/1990
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 10/25/1990
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 10/25/1990
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 10/25/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/25/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/25/1990
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 10/25/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/25/1990
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/25/1990
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/25/1990
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 10/25/1990
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/25/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 10/25/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/25/1990
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 10/25/1990
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/25/1990
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 10/25/1990
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/25/1990
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/25/1990
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/25/1990
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 10/25/1990
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 10/25/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/25/1990
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 10/25/1990
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/25/1990
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/25/1990
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/25/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 10/25/1990
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/25/1990
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/26/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/26/1990