Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/08/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/08/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/08/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/22/1989
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 02/23/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/23/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/02/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/02/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/15/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/15/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/06/1989
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/06/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 04/12/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/13/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/18/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/18/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/09/1989
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 05/09/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 05/09/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/09/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/16/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/01/1989
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/13/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/16/1989
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/16/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/22/1989
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/11/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/11/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 07/11/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/11/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/14/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/11/1990