Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 05/17/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/17/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/17/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/17/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/18/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/09/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/09/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/09/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/19/1989
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/29/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/03/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/19/1989