There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution designating April 28, 1989, as "Flight Attendant Safety Professionals' Day".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/19/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
04/19/1989Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/04/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
05/02/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
04/25/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
04/25/1989-12:00pmHouseReceived in the House.
04/19/1989SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
04/19/1989SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/04/1989SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 04/10/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 04/10/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 04/10/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 04/10/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 04/10/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/10/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/12/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 04/12/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 04/12/1989
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/12/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/12/1989
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 04/12/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/12/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/12/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 04/17/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 04/17/1989
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 04/17/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/17/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 04/17/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 04/17/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 04/17/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/17/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/17/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/17/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/17/1989
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 04/17/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 04/17/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 04/17/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/17/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/17/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 04/17/1989
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/17/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/17/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/17/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 04/17/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 04/17/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/17/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/17/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/17/1989
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/17/1989
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 04/17/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 04/17/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/17/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 04/17/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 04/17/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 04/17/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/17/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/17/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/17/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 04/17/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/17/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/17/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/17/1989
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 04/17/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/17/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/17/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/18/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/18/1989

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary04/04/1989 Referred to
04/19/1989 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service04/25/1989 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population05/02/1989 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.91. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/04/1989)

Designates April 28, 1989, as Flight Attendant Safety Professionals' Day.