Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 05/03/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/03/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 05/03/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 05/03/1989
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/04/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/09/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 05/09/1989
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/09/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 05/09/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/18/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/31/1989
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 05/31/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/31/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/31/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/31/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/31/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/31/1989
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/08/1989

Show cosponsors who withdrew