There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Popular Titles

Veterans Compensation Rate Amendments (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Rate Amendments of 1991

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Compensation Rate Amendments of 1991

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Rate Amendments of 1991

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Rate Amendments of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to increase, effective as of December 1, 1991, the rates of disability compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for survivors of such veterans.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
11/12/1991Became Public Law No: 102-152.
11/12/1991Signed by President.
11/04/1991Presented to President.
10/30/1991Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
10/28/1991Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/28/1991Senate Committee on Veterans discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/29/1991Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/25/1991Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 102-164.
02/21/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (33)

Date Chamber
11/12/1991Became Public Law No: 102-152.
11/12/1991Signed by President.
11/04/1991HousePresented to President.
11/01/1991SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/30/1991-11:10amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/30/1991-11:09amHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
10/30/1991-11:07amHouseMr. Montgomery asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
10/29/1991SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/28/1991SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/28/1991SenateS.Amdt.1275 Amendment SP 1275 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/28/1991SenateAmendment SP 1275 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/28/1991SenateS.Amdt.1275 Proposed by Senator Mitchell for Senator Cranston. To make revisions in the rates of disability compensation, dependency and indemnity compensation, and other compensation, and for other purposes.
10/28/1991SenateAmendment SP 1275 proposed by Senator Mitchell for Senator Cranston.
10/28/1991SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
10/28/1991SenateSenate Committee on Veterans discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/30/1991SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
07/29/1991-1:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/29/1991-1:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/29/1991-12:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
07/29/1991-12:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
07/29/1991-12:55pmHouseMr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/25/1991HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 106.
07/25/1991HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 102-164.
07/23/1991HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/23/1991HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
07/10/1991HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance
07/10/1991HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance
05/03/1991HouseExecutive Comment Received from Veterans' Affairs.
04/16/1991HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance
04/16/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/11/1991HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Veterans' Affairs.
02/21/1991HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/21/1991HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 07/25/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/25/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/25/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/25/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/25/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/25/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/25/1991
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 07/25/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 07/25/1991
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 07/25/1991
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/25/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 07/25/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/25/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 07/25/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 07/25/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 07/25/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/25/1991
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/25/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/25/1991
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 07/25/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 07/25/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/25/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/25/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/25/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/25/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/25/1991

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/21/1991 Referred to
07/23/1991 Markup by
07/25/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-164
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance04/16/1991 Referred to
04/16/1991 Hearings by
07/10/1991 Markup by
07/10/1991 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/30/1991 Referred to
10/28/1991 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.1046.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1046. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/28/1991)

Veterans' Compensation Rate Amendments of 1991 - Increases the rates of: (1) veterans' disability compensation; (2) additional compensation for veterans' dependents; (3) the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans; (4) dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children; and (5) supplemental dependency and indemnity compensation for disabled adult children. Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to adjust administratively the rates of disability compensation payable to persons who are not in receipt of compensation for service-connected disability or death.