Committees: H.R.1046 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/21/1991 Referred to
07/23/1991 Markup by
07/25/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-164
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance04/16/1991 Referred to
04/16/1991 Hearings by
07/10/1991 Markup by
07/10/1991 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/30/1991 Referred to
10/28/1991 Discharged from