Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 02/21/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 02/21/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 02/21/1991
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/20/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 03/20/1991
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 03/20/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/20/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/20/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 03/20/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/20/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 03/20/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/20/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/20/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 03/20/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/20/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 03/20/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 03/20/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/20/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/20/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/23/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/23/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 04/23/1991
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/23/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/23/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 04/23/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 04/23/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/23/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/01/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/01/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/01/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 05/01/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 05/30/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/30/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 05/30/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 05/30/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/30/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 05/30/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 05/30/1991
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/30/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 05/30/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/30/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/30/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/05/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/05/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 06/05/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/05/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/07/1991
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 06/07/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 06/11/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 06/11/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/11/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/11/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/11/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 06/11/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/12/1991
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/12/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/19/1991

Show cosponsors who withdrew