Committees: H.R.1096 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/21/1991 Referred to
05/22/1991 Markup by
07/02/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-138
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands03/04/1991 Referred to
03/12/1991 Hearings by
04/30/1991 Markup by
04/30/1991 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/24/1991 Referred to
09/22/1992 Markup by
09/24/1992 Reported by S.Rept 102-460
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests07/25/1991 Referred to
07/01/1992 Hearings by