Committees: H.R.11 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means01/03/1991 Referred to
06/25/1992 Markup by
06/30/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-631
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Select Revenue Measures04/24/1991 Referred to
07/11/1991 Hearings by
Senate Finance07/21/1992 Referred to
07/29/1992 Markup by
08/03/1992 Reported by