Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 02/26/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 02/26/1991
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/23/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/23/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/23/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/23/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/11/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/09/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/10/1991