Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 02/27/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 02/27/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/27/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 03/20/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/20/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/20/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/20/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/20/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/20/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 03/20/1991
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/11/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/11/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/11/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 04/11/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 04/11/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 04/11/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 04/11/1991
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 04/11/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 04/24/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/24/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 04/24/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/24/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 04/24/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/24/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/24/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 04/24/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/24/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 04/24/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/24/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/24/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/24/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 04/24/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/24/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 04/24/1991
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 04/24/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/24/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 04/24/1991
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 04/24/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 04/24/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/24/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/24/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/24/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 04/24/1991
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/01/1991
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/01/1991
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 05/01/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 05/01/1991
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 05/01/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/01/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/01/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 05/01/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/01/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 05/01/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 05/14/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 05/14/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 05/14/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/14/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/14/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/14/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 05/14/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 05/14/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 05/14/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/14/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 05/14/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/14/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/14/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/14/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 05/14/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 05/14/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/14/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/14/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 05/14/1991
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/14/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/14/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 05/23/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 05/23/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/23/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/23/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/23/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/23/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/03/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 06/03/1991
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 06/03/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/03/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/03/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/03/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 06/03/1991
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 06/03/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 06/03/1991
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 06/03/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/03/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/03/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/03/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/06/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/06/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 06/06/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/06/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/06/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/06/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/11/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/11/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 06/11/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/11/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/11/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 06/11/1991
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 06/11/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/11/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 06/11/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/11/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 06/12/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 06/12/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 06/12/1991
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/12/1991
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 06/12/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/12/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/12/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/19/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/19/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/19/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 06/19/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/19/1991
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/19/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/24/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/24/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/24/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/24/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/24/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/10/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 07/10/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 07/10/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/17/1991
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 07/17/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/17/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 07/18/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/18/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 07/18/1991
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 07/18/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/18/1991
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/18/1991
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/18/1991
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 07/29/1991
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/29/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 07/29/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 07/29/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 08/02/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/02/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 08/02/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/11/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/11/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/11/1991
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/11/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/11/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/24/1991
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/01/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/01/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/23/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/23/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 10/30/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 11/22/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 11/22/1991
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 11/22/1991
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 01/29/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/29/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/25/1992
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 02/25/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/24/1992
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/03/1992
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/30/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/15/1992