There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Incarcerated Veterans Rehabilitation and Readjustment Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the availability of veterans' benefits and services to veterans incarcerated in Federal penal or correctional institutions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/28/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/16/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Intellectual Property and Judicial Administration.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/28/1991Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/1991Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 02/28/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/28/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/28/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/28/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 02/28/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 02/28/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 02/28/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 02/28/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 02/28/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 03/21/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/21/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/21/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/21/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/21/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/21/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/21/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/21/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/21/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 03/21/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/21/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/21/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/21/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/11/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 04/11/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/11/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/11/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 04/11/1991
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/09/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/09/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/09/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/24/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/03/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 10/03/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/03/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/26/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 02/26/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/07/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/29/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/28/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Intellectual Property and Judicial Administration04/16/1991 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs02/28/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1181.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1181. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/1991)

Incarcerated Veterans Rehabilitation and Readjustment Act of 1991 - Title I: Incarcerated Veteran Assessment and Assistance - Directs the Attorney General to identify those individuals who may be veterans among those: (1) entering Federal prisons; and (2) who are incarcerated in such prisons and who are to remain incarcerated for more than 30 days. Requires the Attorney General to transmit to the Secretary of Veterans Affairs the names and locations of such prisoners. Directs the Secretary to inform such prisoners of their ability to have their veteran status determined and to inform those prisoners of their rights to veterans' benefits and services as affected by their incarceration. Outlines other information to be provided.

Requires the Secretary to suspend all debt collection activities being undertaken against any such prisoner for the entire period of incarceration and six months thereafter. Requires such debt collection suspension for Federal, State, or local inmates.

Title II: Incarcerated Veteran Rehabilitation Counseling - Directs the Secretary to: (1) provide readjustment counseling services to those incarcerated veterans suffering from mental and psychological disorders stemming from their military service; (2) safeguard such veterans' possibility of being adjudicated as having service-connected disabilities to the same extent as non-incarcerated veterans; (3) designate an employee from a regional office of the Department of Veterans Affairs to act as a liaison between each Federal prison and the Department for such veterans; (4) review physical examinations of such veterans to determine whether they are eligible for benefits under the Veterans' Dioxin and Radiation Exposure Compensation Standards Act; and (5) ensure that the designated Department liaison provides liaison services between families of incarcerated veterans and Federal prisons.

Directs the Attorney General to: (1) conduct physical examinations, with the incarcerated veterans' consent, for the purpose of aiding in the determination of eligibility for exposure benefits under such Act; (2) transmit such examination results to the Secretary; (3) inform the Secretary of an incarcerated veteran's impending release; and (4) encourage the organization of self-help groups and other similar programs that may contribute to the rehabilitation of incarcerated veterans.

Title III: Readjustment Counseling Education - Directs the Secretary to develop a training curriculum, to be available to individuals, organizations, agencies, and health facilities, for assisting relevant professionals employed by the Bureau of Prisons in acquiring the expertise necessary to diagnose and treat psychiatric disabilities peculiar to veterans.

Title IV: Post-Incarceration Readjustment Services - Requires the Secretary, upon receiving the names of those veterans about to be released from incarceration, to inform them of readjustment benefits and services available to them. Requires the Assistant Secretary of Veterans Affairs to designate a disabled veterans' outreach program specialist in each State where a Federal prison is located to serve as liaison with such prison.

Directs the Chairman of the United States Parole Commission to: (1) integrate the services available from the readjustment counseling program of the Department into the Federal parole program for released veterans; and (2) encourage Federal parole officers to encourage paroled veterans to make use of vet centers and maintain contact with vet center personnel.

Title V: State and Local Outreach Assistance - Directs the Secretary and Assistant Secretary, within six months after enactment of this Act, to implement a program to extend the benefits of this Act to State and local penal institutions with respect to veterans incarcerated in such institutions.

Title VI: Miscellaneous - Directs the Attorney General, the Secretary, the Assistant Secretary, and the Chairman of the U.S. Parole Commission to: (1) report annually to the Congress on their activities in implementing this Act; and (2) sign a memorandum of understanding detailing how the organizations and operations controlled by each shall interact to implement this Act.