Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/22/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/22/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/22/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 04/10/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/10/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/10/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/10/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 04/10/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/10/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 04/23/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 05/07/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 05/07/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 10/05/1992
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/05/1992