Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 01/03/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/11/1991
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 01/11/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 01/11/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/11/1991
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 01/11/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/11/1991
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 01/15/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 01/15/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/24/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 01/24/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/29/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 01/30/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 01/30/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/05/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/05/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/06/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 02/27/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/27/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 03/20/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/20/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 03/20/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/20/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 03/20/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/20/1991
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 03/20/1991
Rep. Luken, Charles [D-OH-1] 04/16/1991
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 04/16/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 04/16/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/16/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/16/1991
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 04/30/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/30/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 04/30/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 05/13/1991
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/13/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/13/1991
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 06/04/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/04/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/04/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/04/1991
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/19/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/19/1991
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 07/10/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/10/1991
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/10/1991
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/10/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 07/24/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/31/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/31/1991
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/31/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 09/12/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/12/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 09/12/1991
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/12/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/12/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 09/12/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 09/12/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/12/1991
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 09/16/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 09/24/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/24/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/10/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/10/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/10/1991
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 10/17/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/17/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/24/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 10/24/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 10/24/1991
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 10/30/1991
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 10/30/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/13/1991
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/13/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 11/13/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 11/13/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 11/13/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 11/13/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/19/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 11/19/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 11/19/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/19/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/19/1991
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/19/1991
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 11/19/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/19/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 11/27/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 02/05/1992
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 02/05/1992
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 02/05/1992
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/07/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 02/07/1992
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 02/07/1992
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 03/11/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 03/11/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/11/1992
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 03/11/1992
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 03/11/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/30/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 07/30/1992